VA HB139 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0703)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0703)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; physician reimbursements; credentialing. Requires health insurers and other carriers that credential the physicians in their provider networks to establish reasonable protocols and procedures for reimbursing a physician who has submitted a completed credentialing application to a carrier, after being credentialed by the carrier, for health care services provided to covered persons during the period in which the applicant's completed credentialing application is pending. The measure establishes minimum requirements for such protocols and procedures. The measure also (i) provides that a carrier is not required to pay reimbursement at the contracted in-network rate for any covered medical services provided by the new provider applicant if the new provider applicant's credentialing application is not approved or the carrier is otherwise not willing to contract with the new provider applicant; (ii) specifies that if a payment is made by the carrier to a physician or any entity that employs or engages the physician for a covered service, the patient is only responsible for any coinsurance, copayments, or deductibles permitted under the insurance contract with the carrier or participating provider agreement with the physician; and (iii) requires new provider applicants to provide notice to covered persons in advance of treatment. Finally, the measure requires the Virginia Department of Health to revise and reenact the regulations regarding managed care health insurance plans.
Title
Health insurance; physician reimbursements, credentialing.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0703) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 703 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB139ER) |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107647D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB139S1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107647D-S1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107647D-S1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (7-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100678D |