VA HB139 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; members and supporters of 4-H. Authorizes the issuance of special license plates for members and supporters of 4-H clubs.
Title
License plates, special; issuance for members and supporters of 4-H clubs.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Transportation |
2014-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2013-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102131D |