VA HB139 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
Summary
Income tax; biodiesel and green diesel fuels producers income tax credit. Allows an income tax credit to biodiesel and green diesel fuels producers in Virginia who produce up to two million gallons of biodiesel or green diesel fuels a year. The amount of the credit is $0.01 per gallon but no more than $5,000 annually for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2008. Includes
Title
Income tax, state; tax credit for certain biodiesel fuels producers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Enacted, Chapter 482 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-03-08 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB139ER2) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Reenrolled | |
2008-03-08 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Governor's substitute printed 082968802-H2 | |
2008-03-06 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-06 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB139ER) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-07 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-07 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB139H1 | |
2008-02-06 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081920676-H1 | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 081920676-H1 | |
2008-02-04 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-15 | House: Assigned Finance sub: 3 | |
2007-12-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2007-12-20 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084433676 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB139 |