VA HB1355 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Moratorium on fossil fuel projects. Establishes a moratorium, effective January 1, 2023, on any approval by any state agency or political subdivision required for (i) electric generating facilities that generate fossil fuel energy through the combustion or use of a fossil fuel resource; (ii) import or export terminals for a fossil fuel resource; (iii) modification of an import or export terminal for a fossil fuel resource; (iv) gathering lines or pipelines for the transport of any fossil fuel resource that requires the use of public land or eminent domain on private property; (v) modification of such gathering lines or pipelines; (vi) refineries of a fossil fuel resource; (vii) any facilities that change the physical state of a fossil fuel resource for the purpose of transporting such fuel; and (viii) exploration for any type of fossil fuel, unless preempted by federal law. The bill requires the establishment of transitional assistance for workers in the fossil fuel industry and affected communities.
Title
Fossil fuel projects; establishes a moratorium.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22102011D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 2 | 1734 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1735 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1736 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |