VA HB135 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency custody and temporary detention; transportation; Emergency custody and temporary detention; transportation; transfer of custody. Provides that, in cases in which transportation of a person subject to an emergency custody order or temporary detention order is ordered to be provided by an alternative transportation provider, the primary law-enforcement agency that executes the order may transfer custody of the person to the alternative transportation provider immediately upon execution of the order, and that the alternative transportation provider shall maintain custody of the person from the time custody is transferred to the alternative transportation provider by the primary law-enforcement agency until such time as custody of the person is transferred to the community services board or its designee that is responsible for conducting the evaluation or the temporary detention facility, as is appropriate. The bill also adds employees of and persons providing services pursuant to a contract with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to the list of individuals who may serve as alternative transportation providers.
Title
Emergency custody and temporary detention; transportation of person when transfer of custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102457D |