VA HB1321 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; student right to representation at proceedings for the violation of institution's policies for the conduct of students. Provides that any student enrolled at a public institution of higher education who is alleged to have committed an offense punishable by a suspension of more than 10 days or by expulsion pursuant to the institution's policies for the conduct of students has the right to be represented, in his discretion and at his expense, by a licensed attorney or a nonattorney advocate for the duration of any disciplinary proceeding or other institutional proceeding regarding the alleged offense. The bill excepts students enrolled at Virginia Military Institute from such right to representation.
Title
Public institutions of higher education; student right to representation at proceedings.
Sponsors
Del. Rick Morris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Education |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2014-11-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-11-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100653D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1321 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1321+hil |