VA HB132 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Limits on prescription of controlled substances containing opioids. Prohibits a prescriber providing treatment for a patient in an emergency department of a corporation, facility, or institution licensed to provide health care from prescribing a controlled substance containing an opioid in a quantity greater than a 10-day supply, as determined in accordance with the prescriber's directions for use. The bill also prohibits a pharmacist from dispensing a controlled substance containing an opioid pursuant to a prescription issued by a prescriber providing treatment to a patient in the emergency department of a corporation, facility, or institution licensed to provide health care unless the prescription complies with the requirements of the bill.
Title
Controlled substances containing opioids; limits on prescription.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101289D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3408.06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |