VA HB1270 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State sales and use tax in the Historic Triangle; sunset; referendum. Repeals the additional state sales tax imposed in the Historic Triangle on July 1, 2026, unless the tax is affirmed by voters in a referendum held in the City of Williamsburg and the Counties of James City and York.
Title
Historic Triangle; state sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Finance |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101403D |