VA HB127 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property and casualty insurance policies; forms and endorsements. Requires property and casualty insurance policies to contain a list of all policy forms and endorsements applicable to that policy, which shall display the respective form numbers and, if those form numbers are not unique identifiers of such forms, the applicable edition dates. The measure will become effective on October 1, 2012.
Title
Property and casualty insurance policies; forms and endorsements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264) | |
2012-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 264 (effective 10/1/12) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-28 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-28 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB127ER) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-23 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Printed as engrossed 12100825D-E | |
2012-01-20 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB127E | |
2012-01-20 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-01-20 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-19 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-17 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100825D |