VA HB1260 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Guardianship; procedures for restriction of communication, visitation, or interaction. Provides that a guardian shall not restrict an incapacitated person's ability to communicate with, visit, or interact with other persons with whom the incapacitated person has an established relationship, unless such restriction is reasonable to prevent physical, mental, or emotional harm to or financial exploitation of such incapacitated person. Under current law, guardians are directed to not unreasonably restrict any such communication, visitation, or interaction. The bill further requires that the guardian provide written notice to any restricted person stating (i) the nature and terms of the restriction, (ii) the reasons why the guardian believes the restriction is necessary, and (iii) how the restricted person may challenge such restriction in court. The bill provides a procedure by which a person whose communication, visits, or interaction with an incapacitated person have been restricted may challenge such restriction in court.
Title
Guardianship; procedures for restriction of communication, visitation, or interaction.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106037D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104553D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 2 | 2009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2019.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |