VA HB1248 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer finance companies. Updates several administrative provisions regarding the regulation of consumer finance companies by the State Corporation Commission's Bureau of Financial Institutions (Bureau). These provisions include matters relating to the licensing process, license suspension and revocation, conducting other types of business, investigations, examinations, fees, recordkeeping, civil penalties, reporting, and enforcement, including the issuance by the Attorney General of civil investigative demands. The measure adds a bonding requirement and authorization to issue cease and desist orders. The measure replaces the existing system under which a separate license is issued by the Bureau for each office in the Commonwealth where a person makes consumer finance loans to one that provides for the issuance of a single license to a consumer finance company, which may allow it to make loans at multiple locations. The measure also authorizes the Bureau to license out-of-state consumer finance companies, including lenders that operate via the Internet. The measure has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2019, and requires the Bureau to establish a procedure that allows applicants to apply for licensure prior to that date. An enactment clause authorizes the Bureau to issue a new license to currently licensed consumer finance companies in good standing upon compliance with the new bonding requirements.
Title
SCC; regulation of consumer finance companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-12 | House | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-12 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105444D-H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 9-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102020D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 2 | 1500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1505.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1508.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1513.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1516 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1517 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1518 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1519 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1524 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1526 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1531 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1532 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1534.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1535 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1537 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1537.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1538 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1539 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1543 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |