VA HB1239 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Personal property tax; classification; emergency. Authorizes localities to classify for rate purposes certain vehicles that, under current law, may be classified only for valuation purposes, including certain automobiles, trucks, motor vehicles for use by the handicapped, motorcycles, mopeds, all-terrain vehicles, off-road motorcycles, campers, and other recreational vehicles. The bill specifies that its provisions shall apply only to taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2022, but before January 1, 2025.
Title
Personal property; other classifications of tangible property for taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption Emergency (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 30 (effective 3/22/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1239ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption Emergency (96-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report withdrawn |
2022-03-11 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Stuart, Petersen, Marsden |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Scott, P.A., Byron, Willett |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-09 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 97-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22107279D-S1 (0-Y 97-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1239S1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107279D-S1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107279D-S1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1239H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Emergency clause added |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105501D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105501D-H1 |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104800D |
Same As/Similar To
SB771 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)
SB771 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)
SB771 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)