VA HB123 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0328)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0328)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mortgage loan applications. Deletes the requirement that a residential mortgage lender's or broker's disclosure statement state that all the loan terms not legally locked in are subject to change until settlement and qualifies the requirement to describe when the interest, points, and fees will be locked in to those loans for which such terms will be locked in. The measure will conform disclosure statement requirements to a federal rule that, effective October 3, 2015, requires that closing disclosures that reflect the actual loan terms be provided to the consumer no later than three business days before consummation of the loan.
Title
Real estate loans; disclosure of terms of mortgage application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0328) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 328 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB123ER) |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-19 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-12-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101534D |