VA HB1224 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0460)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0460)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transfer of property by VDOT; emergency. Authorizes VDOT to convey certain real property located in Tazewell County controlled by the Department.
Title
Real property; VDOT to exchange real property in Tazewell County for private property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0460) | |
2012-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 460 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1224ER) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-29 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-07 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House (82-Y 16-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Printed as engrossed 12104461D-E | |
2012-02-06 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1224E | |
2012-02-06 | House: Emergency clause deleted | |
2012-02-06 | House: Amendments by Delegate Morefield agreed to | |
2012-02-06 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-02 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 7-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2012-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 12104461D |