VA HB1218 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Termination of parental rights. Provides that the residual parental rights of a parent of a child placed in foster care may be terminated if the courts finds, based upon clear and convincing evidence, that it is in the child's best interests and that the parent, without good cause, has been unwilling or unable to substantially remedy the conditions that led to such foster care placement within a reasonable period of time not to exceed 15 total months from the date the child was first placed in foster care within the most recent 22 months. Current law provides that such reasonable period of time is not to exceed 12 months from the date the child was placed in foster care. The bill further requires the court to consider any wishes of a child expressed during a consultation with the child at a permanency planning hearing and to give such wishes weight as the court deems proper, given the child's age, maturity, and circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residual parental rights; termination if in child's best interest, foster care placement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2018-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2018-01-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102214D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161283(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback