VA HB1217 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0310)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0310)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sergeant David Lambert Highway; Sergeant Brandon Asbury Highway. Designates a portion of Virginia Route 19 the “Sergeant Brandon Asbury Highway” and all of Virginia Route 609 in Tazewell County the “Sergeant David Lambert Highway.”
Title
Sergeants David Lambert Highway & Brandon Asbury Highway; designates portions of Routes 19 and 609.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0310) | |
2012-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 310 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1217ER) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-29 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Printed as engrossed 12103312D-E | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1217E | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-09 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2012-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12103312D |