VA HB1217 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0859)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0859)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Firearm safety education program. Allows local school boards to offer firearm safety education programs in the elementary grades. To assist local school boards opting to provide such instruction, the Board of Education must establish a standardized program of firearm safety education for students in the elementary school grades to promote the protection and safety of children. The bill requires that the program objectives incorporate, among other principles of firearm safety, accident prevention and the rules of the National Rifle Association's Eddie Eagle Gunsafe Program. Local school boards offering the program must comply with Board curriculum guidelines and integrate the instruction in appropriate subject areas, if feasible, to ensure that every elementary school student receives instruction in firearm safety education.
Title
Firearm safety education program; school boards may offer in elementary grades.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (68-Y 24-N) (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (68-Y 24-N) (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0859) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 859 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1217ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 7-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (68-Y 24-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (68-Y 24-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1217ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-11 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-10 | House: Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House | |
2010-03-10 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (33-Y 7-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (10-Y 5-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1 | |
2010-01-14 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-01-14 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103810D |