VA HB1217 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327)
Summary
Charter; Town of Lawrenceville. Changes the office of town treasurer from an elected to an appointed position and makes other technical changes.
Title
Charter; Town of Lawrenceville.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 327 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1217ER) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088480756 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1217 |