VA HB1216 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-09 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-09 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Employee Child Care Assistance Pilot Program. Establishes the Employee Child Care Assistance Pilot Program (the Program) to provide matching funds to employers in order to incentivize employers to contribute to the child care costs of their employees. The Program shall be administered by the Virginia Early Childhood Foundation (the Foundation). To participate in the Program, an employer shall agree to make child care contributions to the eligible mixed-delivery provider on behalf of the employee and shall provide any other information deemed necessary by the Foundation. To the extent funds are available, the Foundation shall issue a state match directly to such eligible mixed-delivery provider or to a third-party administrator. Program funds shall be awarded on a first-come, first-served basis; however, the Foundation is encouraged to prioritize awards to small businesses. Employee Child Care Assistance Pilot Program. Establishes the Employee Child Care Assistance Pilot Program (the Program) to provide matching funds to employers in order to incentivize employers to contribute to the child care costs of their employees. The Program shall be administered by the Virginia Early Childhood Foundation (the Foundation). To participate in the Program, an employer shall agree to make child care contributions to the eligible mixed-delivery provider on behalf of the employee and shall provide any other information deemed necessary by the Foundation. To the extent funds are available, the Foundation shall issue a state match directly to such eligible mixed-delivery provider or to a third-party administrator. Program funds shall be awarded on a first-come, first-served basis; however, the Foundation is encouraged to prioritize awards to small businesses.
Title
Employee Child Care Assistance Pilot Program; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 8-N) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (87-Y 8-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (87-Y 8-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1216H1 |
2024-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106356D-H1 |
2024-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106356D-H1 |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-21 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24105032D |