VA HB1210 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Post-election audits. Defines "post-election audit" to mean a process conducted after an election to confirm the accurate reporting of the results of the election and directs the State Board of Elections to establish a work group tasked with developing standards and procedures for conducting post-election audits in the Commonwealth. The work group is required, at a minimum, to (i) consider the types of post-election audits available and being implemented in other states, (ii) recommend the type of post-election audit to be used in the Commonwealth, (iii) establish the process and procedures for conducting the recommended post-election audit, including the timeline, (iv) recommend actions to be taken if the post-election audit results indicate that the voting systems did not accurately count the ballots cast in the election, and (v) propose legislation for implementing the work group's recommendations. The work group is directed to submit an interim progress report by January 7, 2019, and a final report by December 1, 2019, to the Governor and the General Assembly. The bill repeals the current law regarding post-election risk-limiting audits.
Title
Post-election audits; definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (73-Y 25-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1210H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106841D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106841D-H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102957D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 669 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 671.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 671.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |