VA HB1209 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibition on use of show-up identification by law-enforcement officers. Prohibits the use of a show-up identification by any law-enforcement officer. The bill defines a "show-up identification" as an identification procedure in which an eyewitness is presented with a single suspect or single photograph of a suspect for the purpose of determining whether the eyewitness identifies such suspect as the perpetrator. The bill provides that no evidence discovered or obtained as the result of a show-up identification shall be admissible in any trial, hearing, or other proceeding. The bill also requires the written policy and procedures for conducting in-person and photographic lineups established by Department of State Police and each local police department and sheriff's office to include a prohibition on the use of a show-up identification.
Title
Law-enforcement officers; prohibition on use of show-up identification.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103570D |