VA HB1206 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1206
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fort Monroe Authority; duties; facilities management. Adds to the powers and duties of the Fort Monroe Authority the power and duty to create and manage a department within the Authority for the purpose of overseeing and managing all property and facilities provided, owned, operated, or financed by the Authority. Fort Monroe Authority; duties; facilities management. Adds to the powers and duties of the Fort Monroe Authority the power and duty to create and manage a department within the Authority for the purpose of overseeing and managing all property and facilities provided, owned, operated, or financed by the Authority.
Title
Fort Monroe Authority; adds to powers and duties, facilities management.
Sponsors
Del. AC Cordoza [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Cordoza, Morefield, Bulova |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: McPike, Locke, Mason |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (32-Y 7-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104450D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1206 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455