VA HB1201 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed handgun permits; reciprocity. Provides that the Superintendent of State Police shall continue to recognize any valid concealed handgun or concealed weapon permit or license issued by another state where such state's permit or license was, as of November 1, 2015, recognized by the Superintendent of State Police as authorizing the holder of such permit or license to carry a concealed handgun in the Commonwealth. The bill also requires the Superintendent to attempt to reestablish reciprocal recognition of concealed handgun permits with any state where reciprocity may have been lost and report on his efforts to the Clerks of the House and Senate.
Title
Concealed handgun permits; reciprocity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2016-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16104014D |