VA HB1192 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1192
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Aboveground storage tanks; Hazardous Substance Aboveground Storage Tank Fund; civil and criminal penalties. Directs the State Water Control Board to regulate aboveground storage tanks that measure more than 1,320 gallons in capacity and are used to contain hazardous substances other than oil. The bill directs the Board to adopt regulations that establish requirements for registration, certification, and inspection, and other requirements of tank owners, and that establish a schedule of fees. The bill authorizes the Board to undertake corrective action, or to require the owner to undertake corrective action, in the event of a discharge of a hazardous substance. The bill requires tank owners to register their tanks, pay certain registration fees, develop release response plans, upgrade certain older tanks, install containment infrastructure for certain aboveground storage tanks, notify certain parties in the event of a release of a regulated substance, and demonstrate their financial responsibility. The bill also creates the Hazardous Substance Aboveground Storage Tank Fund for the administration of the bill and provides for civil and criminal penalties for violations of requirements of the bill, with the moneys received to be deposited into the existing Virginia Environmental Emergency Response Fund.
Title
Hazardous Substance Aboveground Storage Tank Fund; created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105199D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1192 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.34:29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.34:39 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1192 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1192+hil |