VA HB1177 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Southwest Regional Recreation Authority. Grants the board of the Southwest Regional Recreation Authority the power to establish a ranger police division and appoint rangers who may exercise the powers and duties conferred by law upon local police officers.
Title
Southwest Regional Recreation Authority; board to establish ranger police division.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-03 | House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-02-12 | House: Continued to 2011 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote | |
2010-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102715D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 6021 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 6021.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1177 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1177+hil |