VA HB1174 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-26 - Senate: Subject matter referred by letter to Commission on Immigration pursuant to Rule (L)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-26 - Senate: Subject matter referred by letter to Commission on Immigration pursuant to Rule (L)
Summary
Office of Immigrant Assistance; created. Establishes in the Department of Social Services an Office of Immigrant Assistance, to assist persons lawfully entering the United States and the Commonwealth for the purpose of becoming citizens. The Office shall provide (i) advice and assistance regarding the citizenship application process, and (ii) assistance with finding and securing employment, housing, and services for which such persons may be eligible.
Title
Immigrant Assistance, Office of; created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-26 | Senate: Subject matter referred by letter to Commission on Immigration pursuant to Rule (L) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Continued to 2009 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1174H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 084216600-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources (Hamilton) | |
2008-01-30 | House: Committee substitute printed 084216600-H1 | |
2008-01-29 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-29 | House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082535544 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1174 |