VA HB1170 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Regional electric utility or transportation sector Regional electric utility or transportation sector emissions programs; participation by Commonwealth. Prohibits the Governor or any state agency or political subdivision from adopting any regulation, rule, or guidance document that establishes or authorizes the Commonwealth to join or participate in a regional program addressing emissions from the electric utility sector or transportation sector unless the program requires that all of the proceeds from the sale of emissions allowances be returned to customers in the Commonwealth.
Title
Regional electric utility programs; participation by Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103356D |