IL HB4819 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall provide lactation or nursing mothers rooms for personnel of the Department. Provides that these rooms shall be used exclusively for nursing mothers. The rooms shall be provided in each facility of the Department that employs nursing mothers. Specifies the requirements for the lactation or nursing mothers rooms.
Title
CD CORR-DOC-LACTATION ROOMS
Sponsors
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Tom Weber [R] | Rep. Kevin Schmidt [R] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
Sen. Mark Walker [D] | Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2024 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2024 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000 |
2024-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-2-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |