VA HB1165 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tramadol; add to Schedule IV. Adds tramadol to Schedule IV of the Drug Control Act.
Title
Schedule IV; adds tramadol to list.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-03 | House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-02-09 | House: Continued to 2011 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-20 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #4 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101226D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1165 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1165+hil |