VA HB1151 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; applicants for employment; criminal history. Prohibits each school board from employing any individual who has been convicted of a violent felony set forth in subsection C of §17.1-805 of the Code of Virginia or any offense involving the sexual molestation, physical or sexual abuse, or rape of a child and permits each school board to employ any individual who has been convicted of any felony or crime of moral turpitude that is not set forth in subsection C of §17.1-805 of the Code of Virginia and does not involve the sexual molestation, physical or sexual abuse, or rape of a child.
Title
School boards; applicants for employment.
Sponsors
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16103431D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB1151 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1151+hil |