VA HB1151 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Finance (HB238-Cosgrove) by voice vote
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Finance (HB238-Cosgrove) by voice vote
Summary
Corporate tax subtraction and sales tax exemption for space flight entities. Provides a corporate income tax subtraction for any gain recognized as a result of (i) passenger ticket sales on a suborbital spaceflight and (ii) resupply services contracts entered with NASA. It also extends the current sales and use tax exemption to include the sale of spaceflight services or activities to spaceflight participants and it extends the sunset date for the exemption to July 1, 2015.
Title
Income tax, corporate; sales tax exemption for space flight entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-04 | House: Incorporated by Finance (HB238-Cosgrove) by voice vote | |
2008-01-15 | House: Assigned Finance sub: 2 | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080597680 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1151 |