VA HB1131 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1224)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Solar energy projects; revenue share assessment. Authorizes any locality by ordinance to assess a revenue share of up to $1,400 per megawatt on any solar photovoltaic (electric energy) project with certain exceptions and expands an existing tax exemption for such projects under certain conditions. The bill authorizes such revenue share to apply to existing projects only if certain conditions are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar energy projects; revenue share assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (49-Y 44-N) (Y: 49 N: 43 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1224)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1224 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1131ER2)
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (30-Y 10-N)
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (49-Y 44-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (49-Y 44-N)
2020-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-12HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-03-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1131ER)
2020-02-26HouseEnrolled
2020-02-21SenatePassed Senate (32-Y 6-N)
2020-02-21SenateRead third time
2020-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 42-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 42-N)
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1131H1
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107253D-H1
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107253D-H1
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N)
2020-01-23HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103166D

Same As/Similar To

SB762 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1270)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5812636(n/a)See Bill Text
5813660(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1131&201+sum+HB1131
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1131+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1131H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1131ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1131ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1224+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1002V0034+HB1131
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0080+HB1131
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0182+HB1131
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0231+HB1131
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0705+HB1131
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0356+HB1131
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0771HB1131+HB1131
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0811HB1131+HB1131
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2031HB1131+HB1131
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2175+HB1131

Bill Comments

feedback