VA SB762 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1270)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Solar energy projects; revenue share assessment. Authorizes any locality by ordinance to assess a revenue share of up to $1,400 per megawatt on any solar photovoltaic (electric energy) project with certain exceptions and expands an existing tax exemption for such projects under certain conditions. The bill authorizes such revenue share to apply to existing projects only if certain conditions are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar energy projects; revenue share assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption #2 (48-Y 44-N) (Y: 48 N: 43 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (48-Y 44-N) (Y: 48 N: 43 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 36-N) (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1270)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1270 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled bill text (SB762ER2)
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: Adoption #2 (48-Y 44-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (48-Y 44-N)
2020-04-22HouseReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: Adoption (48-Y 44-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (48-Y 44-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB762ER)
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled
2020-02-27HouseVOTE: Passage (58-Y 36-N)
2020-02-27HousePassed House (58-Y 36-N)
2020-02-27HouseRead third time
2020-02-26HouseRead second time
2020-02-24HouseReported from Finance (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB762S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107247D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107247D-S1
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103370D

Same As/Similar To

HB1131 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1224)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5812636(n/a)See Bill Text
5813660(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB762&201+sum+SB762
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB762+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB762S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB762ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB762ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1270+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0252+SB0762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0762+SB0762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0762+SB0762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0762+SB0762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0762+SB0762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0762+SB0762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0349+SB0762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1569+SB0762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1954SB0762+SB0762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2296+SB0762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2280+SB0762

Bill Comments

feedback