VA HB113 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Separation of powers; Opportunity Educational Institution abolished. Abolishes the Opportunity Educational Institution.
Title
Opportunity Educational Institution; abolished.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Education |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-12-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100815D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 27.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 27.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 7.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB113 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB113+hil |