VA HB1114 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Additional real property tax on commercial and industrial property in certain localities.
Title
Real property; additional tax on commercial and industrial property in certain localities.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Finance |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104361D |