VA HB1113 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - Stricken from docket by Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - Stricken from docket by Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation funding; statewide prioritization process. Requires the Commonwealth Transportation Board, when administering SMART SCALE, to ensure that projects are evaluated for district grant program funds and high-priority funds separately, and that the projects selected in one program do not impact the other program. The bill requires the Board to weight congestion mitigation at at least 55 percent in the Northern Virginia and Hampton Roads highway construction districts. The bill requires that projects eligible for district grant program funds receive a district-specific score and an overall score. Transportation funding; statewide prioritization process. Requires the Commonwealth Transportation Board, when administering SMART SCALE, to ensure that projects are evaluated for district grant program funds and high-priority funds separately, and that the projects selected in one program do not impact the other program. The bill requires the Board to weight congestion mitigation at at least 55 percent in the Northern Virginia and Hampton Roads highway construction districts. The bill requires that projects eligible for district grant program funds receive a district-specific score and an overall score.
Title
Transportation funding; statewide prioritization process for project selection.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Stricken from docket by Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Stricken from docket by Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104357D |