VA HB1106 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-29-1)
Status: Passed on February 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-29-1)
Status: Passed on February 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Behavior analysts; licensure by Board of Medicine. Gives the Board of Medicine authority to license behavior analysts and assistant behavior analysts. The bill also requires the Board to promulgate emergency regulations within 280 days of enactment and contains an emergency clause.
Title
Behavior and assistant behavior analysts; licensure by Board of Medicine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003) | |
2012-02-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 3 (effective 2/7/12) | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-01-31 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-01-31 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1106ER) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-20 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (96-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Read third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-19 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1106H1 | |
2012-01-19 | House: Emergency clause added | |
2012-01-19 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104159D-H1 | |
2012-01-19 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-18 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-17 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104159D-H1 | |
2012-01-17 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101385D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Licenses, Business
Professions and Occupations
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Licenses, Business
Professions and Occupations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |