VA HB1103 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Primary system highway construction funds allocation. Allocates primary system highway construction funds among the nine highway construction districts on the basis of the ratio of vehicle miles traveled on primary highways divided by the lane miles of primary highways in each highway construction district, weighted 90%, and a need factor, weighted 10%.
Title
Primary system highway construction funds; allocation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by with letter by voice vote | |
2010-01-22 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #4 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101028D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1103 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1103+hil |