VA HB1101 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State and local elections officials; acceptance of certain gifts and funding prohibited. Prohibits state and local elections officials from soliciting, accepting, using, or disposing of any moneys, grants, property, or services given by a private individual or nongovernmental entity for the purpose of funding voter education and outreach programs, voter registration programs, or any other expense incurred in the conduct of elections. The bill specifically provides that the operation of a polling place or voter satellite office in a facility furnished by a private individual or nongovernmental entity is not a violation of this prohibition.
Title
Election officials, state and local; acceptance of certain gifts and funding prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102653D |