VA HB1094 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Statewide Building Code; enforcement on Indian tribal lands. Provides that the Department of General Services shall not be required to function as the building official for enforcement of the Uniform Statewide Building Code on Indian tribal lands if the Indian tribe in possession of the property has retained one or more qualified firms or individuals to perform building official functions.
Title
Uniform Statewide Building Code; enforcement on Indian tribal lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in General Laws |
2014-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14101162D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1094 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1094+hil |