VA HB1086 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378)
Summary
Appeals to boards of zoning appeals. Provides that a written notice of a zoning violation or a written order of the zoning administrator that includes such statement sent by registered or certified mail to, or posted at, the last known address of the property owner as shown on the current real estate tax assessment books or current real estate tax assessment records shall be deemed sufficient notice to the property owner and shall satisfy the notice requirements under general law.
Title
Zoning appeals; written notice of zoning violation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378) | |
2008-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 378 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1086ER) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-06 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-06 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087039324 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1086 |