VA HB1072 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Golf carts and utility vehicles; Town of Smithfield. Authorizes the governing body of the Town of Smithfield to, by ordinance, authorize a golf cart or utility vehicle to be operated on a designated public highway where the posted speed limit is 35 miles per hour or less. The bill also authorizes a golf cart or utility vehicle in the Town of Smithfield to cross any highway marked as a golf cart crossing by the Department of Transportation. Golf carts and utility vehicles; Town of Smithfield. Authorizes the governing body of the Town of Smithfield to, by ordinance, authorize a golf cart or utility vehicle to be operated on a designated public highway where the posted speed limit is 35 miles per hour or less. The bill also authorizes a golf cart or utility vehicle in the Town of Smithfield to cross any highway marked as a golf cart crossing by the Department of Transportation.
Title
Golf carts and utility vehicles; operation of vehicles on public highways in Town of Smithfield.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Transportation |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 Highway Safety and Policy |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101988D |