VA HB1054 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public records; retention and destruction of original records by clerk. Clarifies inconsistencies between the law governing the retention and destruction of original public records by the clerk of the circuit court and the Public Records Management Act.
Title
Public records; retention and destruction of original records by clerk of circuit court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-30 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102767D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1412 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 391 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB1054 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1054+hil |