VA HB1046 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1046
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; plan for a process to allow direct purchase of over-the-counter medications and medical supplies; report. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to study options for and develop a plan to implement a process by which recipients of medical assistance services shall receive payments that may be used to purchase over-the-counter medications and medical supplies prescribed by an authorized prescriber directly in a retail setting and to report its findings and plan to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committees on Appropriations and Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committees on Finance and Appropriations and Education and Health by December 1, 2022. Department of Medical Assistance Services; plan for a process to allow direct purchase of over-the-counter medications and medical supplies; report. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to study options for and develop a plan to implement a process by which recipients of medical assistance services shall receive payments that may be used to purchase over-the-counter medications and medical supplies prescribed by an authorized prescriber directly in a retail setting and to report its findings and plan to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committees on Appropriations and Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committees on Finance and Appropriations and Education and Health by December 1, 2022.
Title
Over-the-counter medications, etc.; DMAS to study plan for a process to allow direct purchase.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Barker, Dunnavant, Boysko |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Scott, P.A., Orrock, Hayes |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-09 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 95-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 95-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22101304D-E |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1046E |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101304D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1046 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Subjects
Fraud
Medical Treatment Care and Assistance
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Medical Treatment Care and Assistance
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation