VA HB104 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on December 17 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-08 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB91-Albo) by voice vote
Status: Introduced on December 17 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-08 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB91-Albo) by voice vote
Summary
Driving without a driver's license; penalties. Provides that any person charged with driving without having first obtained a valid driver's license shall be placed under arrest and shall have his fingerprints and photograph taken. Additionally, the person's vehicle is to be impounded for 30 days. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Driver's license; penalty for driving without.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-08 | House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB91-Albo) by voice vote | |
2008-01-24 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-22 | House: Referred from Rules by voice vote | |
2007-12-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2007-12-17 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080563404 |
Same As/Similar To
HB91 (Similar To) 2008-02-25 - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (6-Y 8-N 1-A)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB104 |