VA HB1024 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Parental Choice Education Savings Accounts established. Permits the parents of qualified students, defined in the bill, to apply to the school division in which the qualified student resides for a one-year, renewable Parental Choice Education Savings Account that consists of an amount that is equivalent to a certain percentage of all applicable annual Standards of Quality per pupil state funds appropriated for public school purposes and apportioned to the resident school division in which the qualified student resides, including the per pupil share of state sales tax funding in basic aid and any state per pupil share of special education funding for which the qualified student is eligible. The bill permits the parent of the qualified student to use the moneys in such account for certain education-related expenses of the qualified student, including tuition, deposits, fees, and required textbooks at a private elementary school or secondary school that is located in the Commonwealth. The bill also contains provisions relating to auditing, rescinding, and reviewing expenses made from such accounts.
Title
Parental Choice Education Savings Accounts; established, definition of poverty guidelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100732D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 222.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 222.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |