VA HB1021 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State Asset Maximization Commission. Creates the State Asset Maximization Commission and sets its membership and duties. The bill provides that the Commission will cease to exist on July 1, 2015.
Title
State Asset Maximization Commission; created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Rules | |
2010-01-29 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102295D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1021 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1021+hil |