UT SJR101 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Approving the Acceptance of Federal Funds
Title
Joint Resolution Approving the Acceptance of Federal Funds
Sponsors
Sen. Don Ipson [R] | Rep. Bradley Last [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-05-20 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-20 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-19 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-19 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-19 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-05-18 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-05-18 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-05-17 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-05-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-05-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |