UT SJR012 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Supporting a National Hockey League Franchise in Utah
Title
Joint Resolution Supporting a National Hockey League Franchise in Utah
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-12 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-12 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-12 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2024-02-09 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2024-02-09 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2024-02-09 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2024-02-09 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Special Orders Calendar |
2024-02-06 | House | House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in House Special Orders Calendar |
2024-02-06 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-06 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-29 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-29 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-25 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |