UT SJR009 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Approving Compensation of In-session Employees
Title
Joint Resolution Approving Compensation of In-session Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2010-02-22 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-18 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-18 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-02-17 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-02-17 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-02-17 | House/ under suspension of the rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-17 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2010-02-11 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2010-02-05 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP | |
2010-02-05 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |